NY S06237 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the collection of supervision fees from persons on community supervision and provides that the department may promulgate rules and regulations to establish alternative methods for payment of supervision fees.
Title
Relates to the collection of supervision fees from persons on community supervision and provides that the department may promulgate rules and regulations to establish alternative methods for payment of supervision fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.201 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.595 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a9315 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.967 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-09 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09315 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - substituted by s6237