NY S06232 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a sales tax exemption for fresh cut evergreen trees and evergreen products during the period from November 1st to December 31st.
Title
Relates to a sales tax exemption for fresh cut evergreen trees and evergreen products during the period from November 1st to December 31st.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1687 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6232A |
2016-02-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09114 (Same As) 2016-03-23 - print number 9114a