NY S06231 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - SIGNED CHAP.392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - SIGNED CHAP.392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that people receiving a United States Postal Service disability pension are eligible to participate in the disability rent increase exemption program.
Title
Provides that people receiving a United States Postal Service disability pension are eligible to participate in the disability rent increase exemption program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.392 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.178 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a8679 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1094 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO AGING |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08679 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6231