NY S06213 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Roger J. Mazal Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Roger J. Mazal Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02AssemblySIGNED CHAP.144
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.607
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8013a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1787
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 6213A
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-23SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A08013 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6213a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback