NY S06195 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ballots submitted in envelopes that are sealed with tape, paste or any other binding agent or device and have no indication of tampering.
Title
Relates to ballots submitted in envelopes that are sealed with tape, paste or any other binding agent or device and have no indication of tampering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1177 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1343 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01177 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - signed chap.472