NY A01177 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - signed chap.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - signed chap.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ballots submitted in envelopes that are sealed with tape, paste or any other binding agent or device and have no indication of tampering.
Title
Relates to ballots submitted in envelopes that are sealed with tape, paste or any other binding agent or device and have no indication of tampering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-20 | Assembly | signed chap.472 |
2023-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1343 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6195 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.128 |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06195 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1177