NY S06154 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the minimum charge for the supply of water by the New York city municipal water finance authority and the New York city water board.
Title
Abolishes the minimum charge for the supply of water by the New York city municipal water finance authority and the New York city water board.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1395 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09226 (Same As) 2014-04-02 - referred to cities