NY S06025 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6025A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6025A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state lands located within the boundaries of the Caumsett State Historic Park Preserve, in the county of Suffolk, to be subject to taxation for all purposes.
Title
Designates state lands located within the boundaries of the Caumsett State Historic Park Preserve, in the county of Suffolk, to be subject to taxation for all purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6025A |
2020-06-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1579 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |