NY S05968 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to distribute certain federal funds for the purpose of educating either unaccompanied minors or English language learners.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to distribute certain federal funds for the purpose of educating either unaccompanied minors or English language learners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1394 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5968A |
2016-05-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1762 |
2015-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08290 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - print number 8290a