NY S05936 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires review of all motor vehicle repair shop applicants which includes community input.
Title
Requires review of all motor vehicle repair shop applicants which includes community input.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.795 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5936A |
2024-03-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06951 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - print number 6951a