NY S05915 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 5915C
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 5915C
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires monitoring by DEC of water contamination throughout the state and notification to residents of the state of such contamination by the department of health and the public health and health planning council; provides that the department of health shall disseminate special alerts to the public through television, radio and social media outlets where DEC determines unacceptable levels of water contamination.
Title
Requires monitoring by DEC of water contamination throughout the state and notification to residents of the state of such contamination by the department of health and the public health and health planning council; provides that the department of health shall disseminate special alerts to the public through television, radio and social media outlets where DEC determines unacceptable levels of water contamination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5915C |
2012-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5915B |
2012-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-11-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5915A |
2011-11-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2011-10-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09040 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - print number 9040a