NY S05774 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - VETOED MEMO.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - VETOED MEMO.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOT to determine which entrances to parkways in Westchester county are most frequently accessed by oversized commercial vehicles and to install certain barriers to prevent such vehicles from accessing such entrances.
Title
Requires the DOT to determine which entrances to parkways in Westchester county are most frequently accessed by oversized commercial vehicles and to install certain barriers to prevent such vehicles from accessing such entrances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.225 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.514 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a654a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5774A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.999 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1691 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00654 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s5774a