NY S05773 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7911B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7911B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the disclosure of unemployment insurance information with public entities for certain purposes.
Title
Permits the disclosure of unemployment insurance information with public entities for certain purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7911B |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1658 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5773A |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07911 (Same As) 2013-10-23 - signed chap.456