NY S05764 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health, within fiscal year 2009-2010, to contract with high bidders to perform pilot projects to assess the feasibility of reducing medically unnecessary high cost radiological procedures and generalizing cost savings to the state through enhanced medical management and prior review of orders for diagnostic imaging.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health, within fiscal year 2009-2010, to contract with high bidders to perform pilot projects to assess the feasibility of reducing medically unnecessary high cost radiological procedures and generalizing cost savings to the state through enhanced medical management and prior review of orders for diagnostic imaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES | |
2010-01-06 | returned to senate | |
2010-01-06 | died in assembly | |
2009-07-17 | referred to health | |
2009-07-16 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.926 | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-03 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A8792 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to health