NY S05743 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8356A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8356A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the statewide certification program for participation by minority group members and women with respect to state contracts.
Title
Relates to the statewide certification program for participation by minority group members and women with respect to state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8356A |
2011-06-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5743A |
2011-06-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1335 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08356 (Same As) 2012-01-03 - tabled