NY S05707 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.328
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.328
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes farm brewery licensees to sell wine and spirits manufactured by the licensee or a licensed farm winery or distillery.
Title
Authorizes farm brewery licensees to sell wine and spirits manufactured by the licensee or a licensed farm winery or distillery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.328 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7960a |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.164 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5707A |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2015-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07960 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - substituted by s5707a