NY A07960 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - substituted by s5707a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - substituted by s5707a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes farm brewery licensees to sell wine and spirits manufactured by a licensed farm winery or distillery.
Title
Authorizes farm brewery licensees to sell wine and spirits manufactured by a licensed farm winery or distillery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s5707a |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.165 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | print number 7960a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05707 (Same As) 2016-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.328