NY S05667 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the disposal of computers through donation to not-for-profit institutions for use by senior citizens or low income individuals.
Title
Authorizes the disposal of computers through donation to not-for-profit institutions for use by senior citizens or low income individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8124 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1349 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08124 (Same As) 2011-08-15 - signed chap.390