NY S05597 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the expiration of and makes permanent provisions of law establishing the property tax cap.
Title
Eliminates the expiration of and makes permanent provisions of law establishing the property tax cap.
Sponsors
Sen. John Flanagan [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1955 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.857 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |