NY S05584 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the provision of refund anticipation loans by person and entities other than banking institutions; requires that at the time a borrower applies for a refund anticipation loan, a facilitator shall disclose to such borrower certain information relating to fees and interest rates; defines terms.
Title
Regulates the provision of refund anticipation loans by person and entities other than banking institutions; requires that at the time a borrower applies for a refund anticipation loan, a facilitator shall disclose to such borrower certain information relating to fees and interest rates; defines terms.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO BANKS | |
2009-05-19 | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A8161 (Same As) 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
A10331 (Same As) 2010-03-18 - referred to banks
A10331 (Same As) 2010-03-18 - referred to banks