NY S05558 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of East Hampton, county of Suffolk, to reduce the maximum speed limit along certain designated streets in such town to not less than twenty miles per hour.
Title
Authorizes the town of East Hampton, county of Suffolk, to reduce the maximum speed limit along certain designated streets in such town to not less than twenty miles per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.680 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.800 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07174 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation