NY S05558 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides death benefits and health insurance coverage to eligible survivors of public employees who die while ordered to service in the uniformed services.
Title
Provides death benefits and health insurance coverage to eligible survivors of public employees who die while ordered to service in the uniformed services.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.582 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.442 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7835b |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1170 |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07835 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - substituted by s5558