NY S05548 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to identify any advisory panel, board, task force, and other similar entity which has been established in the environmental conservation law and which has been inactive for at least five years.
Title
Requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to identify any advisory panel, board, task force, and other similar entity which has been established in the environmental conservation law and which has been inactive for at least five years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-12-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5548B |
2011-12-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5548A |
2011-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08041 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - enacting clause stricken