NY S05500 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of chapter 329 of the laws of 2009, amending the family court act and the social services law, relating to removing special powers granted to the society for the prevention of cruelty to children.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of chapter 329 of the laws of 2009, amending the family court act and the social services law, relating to removing special powers granted to the society for the prevention of cruelty to children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | signed chap.155 |
2019-07-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1327 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5500 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.534 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6593 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1327 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06593 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - signed chap.155