NY S05485 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rate of regular interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for the purpose of calculating contributions to retirement systems.
Title
Relates to the rate of regular interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for the purpose of calculating contributions to retirement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8012 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1131 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08012 (Same As) 2011-07-20 - signed chap.180