NY S05470 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.65
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.65
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain providers that extend specific terms of commercial financing to a recipient to disclose certain information about the offer to the recipient, including information concerning the financing amount, finance charges, the annual percentage rate, the total repayment amount, the term, payment amounts, other potential fees, any prepayment costs and a description of any collateral requirements.
Title
Requires certain providers that extend specific terms of commercial financing to a recipient to disclose certain information about the offer to the recipient, including information concerning the financing amount, finance charges, the annual percentage rate, the total repayment amount, the term, payment amounts, other potential fees, any prepayment costs and a description of any collateral requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.65 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.369 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.264 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10118a |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.886 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5470B |
2020-07-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5470A |
2020-03-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A10118 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.65