NY S05423 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Dissolves the West Park union free school district, in the town of Esopus in the county of Ulster; provides for the payment of the debts and obligations of such school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dissolves the West Park union free school district, in the town of Esopus in the county of Ulster; provides for the payment of the debts and obligations of such school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblyVETOED MEMO.166
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.415
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8272a
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to education
2012-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5423B
2012-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1223
2012-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2011-06-24SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2011-06-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-06-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-06-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1086
2011-06-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 5423A
2011-06-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2011-05-19SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A08272 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s5423b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05423&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05423&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05423
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05423&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05423A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05423&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05423B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/S5423#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05423&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback