VA HB1085 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1085ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Environmental Quality; PFAS; identification; monitoring; PFAS Expert Advisory Committee established; report. Requires, for every public water system, as defined in the bill, the Department of Health (VDH) to assist the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) by transferring to the Department quarterly all validated monitoring results available to VDH that indicate PFAS MCL exceedances, as defined in the bill. In such circumstances, the Department is required to develop and implement a plan to prioritize and conduct PFAS assessments for identifying significant sources of PFAS in such public water system's raw water source or sources. The bill requires certain facilities, if deemed by the Department to be a potentially significant source of PFAS in the public water system's raw water source, (i) to perform and promptly report the results of quarterly discharge monitoring for one year and (ii) to report to the Department, within 90 days after being directed by the Department, its manufacture or use of PFAS. The bill establishes a PFAS Expert Advisory Committee to assist the Department and VDH in its PFAS-related efforts and requires the Committee to meet at least two times per year through June 30, 2027, and to annually report certain information to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PFAS Expert Advisory Committee; established, monitoring sources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1085ER)
2024-02-28HouseEnrolled
2024-02-23SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-23SenateRead third time
2024-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-21SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2024-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2024-02-16SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N)
2024-02-15SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2024-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-13HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2024-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2024-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1085H2
2024-02-12HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 24106954D-H2
2024-02-12HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources substitute rejected 24106713D-H1
2024-02-12HouseRead second time
2024-02-09HouseRead first time
2024-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 24106954D-H2
2024-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2024-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-31HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2024-01-31HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2024-01-31HouseIncorporates HB245 (Bulova)
2024-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 24106713D-H1
2024-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N)
2024-01-23HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2024-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2024-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105105D

Same As/Similar To

SB243 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB243ER)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.34:29(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.34:33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1085
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1085+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1085H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1085H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1085ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24106428D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24106713D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/24106954D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1085F164+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1085FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1085FH2122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1085FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H0102V0011+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H01V0033+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H0201V0026+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H02V0141+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0769+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S01V0063+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0346+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0544HB1085+HB1085
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0581HB1085+HB1085

Bill Comments

feedback