GA HB461 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding specific, business, and occupation taxes, so as to require that the proceeds of local government regulatory fees be used to pay for regulatory activity and not general operations; to revise the list of professions which may be subject to such regulatory fees; to remove certain provisions authorizing calculation of regulatory fees for renovation and other construction projects; to provide for refunds in certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; proceeds to local government regulatory fees be used to pay for regulatory activity and not general operations; require
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #845 (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #739 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 461, Hb 1090: Senate Vote #713 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Passage: House Vote #459 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #739 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 461, Hb 1090: Senate Vote #713 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Passage: House Vote #459 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Hopper |