NH HB2024 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2370e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2370e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state 10-year transportation improvement plan; relative to adding a speed limit of 45 miles per hour on rural highways; relative to disability pensions for public safety employees who are victims of violence; and making a capital appropriation to the department of corrections toward the replacement of the New Hampshire state prison for men.
Title
Relative to the state 10-year transportation improvement plan; relative to adding a speed limit of 45 miles per hour on rural highways; relative to disability pensions for public safety employees who are victims of violence; and making a capital appropriation to the department of corrections toward the replacement of the New Hampshire state prison for men.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2370e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2370e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Report 2024-2260c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2024-2260c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2024; Senate Journal 17 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2260c; 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/04/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Ricciardi, Bradley, Watters; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Ricciardi Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2002s 2024-2194S 2024-2187s and 2024-2167s and Requests CofC (Reps. McConkey, Milz, Cloutier, Eaton): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/29/2024 House Journal 14 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-2002s, 2024-2194S, 2024-2187s, and 2024-2167s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2024-2167s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2024-2187s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2024-2194s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-2002s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to after HB 1633, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-2002s, 05/22/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0961h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 190 |
2024-03-28 | House | FLAM # 2024-1269h (Rep. B. Boyd): Amendment Failed DV 172-195 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 189 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0961h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 187 |
2024-03-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-03-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0961h 03/05/2024 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 34 |
2024-02-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/23/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2023-12-19 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 |