NY A08272 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s5423b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s5423b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dissolves the West Park union free school district, in the town of Esopus in the county of Ulster; provides for the payment of the debts and obligations of such school district.
Title
Dissolves the West Park union free school district, in the town of Esopus in the county of Ulster; provides for the payment of the debts and obligations of such school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5423b |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.415 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.415 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | print number 8272a |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05423 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.166