NY S05363 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5363B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5363B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a wage data clearinghouse.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a wage data clearinghouse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5363B |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5363A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02164 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES