NY S05363 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to travel insurance; includes loss of baggage or personal effects, interruption or cancellation of trip and damages to accommodations or rental vehicles; lists related provisions.
Title
Relates to travel insurance; includes loss of baggage or personal effects, interruption or cancellation of trip and damages to accommodations or rental vehicles; lists related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2016-02-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.89 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1115 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07971 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to insurance