NY S05360 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to independent hearing officers for disciplinary hearings involving any paid officer or member of an organized fire company or fire department of a city of less than one million population, or town, village or fire district.
Title
Relates to independent hearing officers for disciplinary hearings involving any paid officer or member of an organized fire company or fire department of a city of less than one million population, or town, village or fire district.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.197 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6546 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.772 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06546 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5360