NY A06546 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to independent hearing officers for disciplinary hearings involving any paid officer or member of an organized fire company or fire department of a city of less than one million population, or town, village or fire district.
Title
Relates to independent hearing officers for disciplinary hearings involving any paid officer or member of an organized fire company or fire department of a city of less than one million population, or town, village or fire district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5360 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.146 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05360 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.197