NY S05355 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of governmental signage or other metal property.
Title
Relates to the sale of governmental signage or other metal property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1552 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-10-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5355A |
2015-10-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07613 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to economic development