NY S05344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an occupancy tax in the city of Cortland to be used for tourism development and promotion.
Title
Imposes an occupancy tax in the city of Cortland to be used for tourism development and promotion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.250 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1510 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5344 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.392 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.392 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7390 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1510 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07390 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled