NY S05281 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to reschedule cancelled regents examinations within 20 business days of the original date.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to reschedule cancelled regents examinations within 20 business days of the original date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.577 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5281A |
2018-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.836 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06889 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - enacting clause stricken