NY S05236 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain documents and forms to be provided in the twelve most common non-English languages spoken by limited English proficient immigrants of five years or less according to the American community survey, as published by the United States census bureau.
Title
Requires certain documents and forms to be provided in the twelve most common non-English languages spoken by limited English proficient immigrants of five years or less according to the American community survey, as published by the United States census bureau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5236B |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.263 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5236A |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1490 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07428 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - print number 7428b