NY S05202 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims and actions against the New York city school construction authority arising out of contracts; provides accrual of claims shall be deemed to have occurred as of the date payment for the amount claimed was denied.
Title
Relates to claims and actions against the New York city school construction authority arising out of contracts; provides accrual of claims shall be deemed to have occurred as of the date payment for the amount claimed was denied.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5202B |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.800 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5202A |
2012-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07768 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES