NY S05136 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to authorizing sweepstakes with respect to subscriptions to "The Conservationist" from August 1, 2015 to August 1, 2018.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to authorizing sweepstakes with respect to subscriptions to "The Conservationist" from August 1, 2015 to August 1, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.210 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.428 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7917 |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1081 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07917 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5136