NY S05124 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care facilities to report incidents of a sexual offense to the departments of health and education.
Title
Requires health care facilities to report incidents of a sexual offense to the departments of health and education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05474 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - held for consideration in health