NY S05025 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a legislative task force on outdoor environmental education and recreation that will benefit residents of New York state by fostering stewardship and conservation of the environment, and an appreciation of the importance of the wise use of natural resources as well as acknowledgment of the health benefits of time spent in nature.
Title
Creates a legislative task force on outdoor environmental education and recreation that will benefit residents of New York state by fostering stewardship and conservation of the environment, and an appreciation of the importance of the wise use of natural resources as well as acknowledgment of the health benefits of time spent in nature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.617 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5025A |
2021-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.502 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |