NY S05025 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan transportation authority to report to the governor and the legislature on service reductions and eliminations.
Title
Directs the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan transportation authority to report to the governor and the legislature on service reductions and eliminations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6249 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1095 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06249 (Same As) 2013-11-08 - tabled