NY S05025 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Cortland until 2013.
Title
Relates to extending authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Cortland until 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.248 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.189 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a7513 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.836 |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07513 (Same As) 2011-06-14 - substituted by s5025