NY S04989 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in order to qualify to file for no fault divorce, where a marriage is broken down irretrievably and the non-petitioning spouse is a documented victim of domestic violence by the petitioning spouse, the non-petitioning spouse must consent to the divorce in order for it to occur.
Title
Provides that in order to qualify to file for no fault divorce, where a marriage is broken down irretrievably and the non-petitioning spouse is a documented victim of domestic violence by the petitioning spouse, the non-petitioning spouse must consent to the divorce in order for it to occur.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.264 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4989A |
2012-02-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06992 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in judiciary