NY A06992 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in order to qualify to file for no fault divorce, where a marriage is broken down irretrievably and the non-petitioning spouse is a documented victim of domestic violence by the petitioning spouse, the non-petitioning spouse must consent to the divorce in order for it to occur.
Title
Provides that in order to qualify to file for no fault divorce, where a marriage is broken down irretrievably and the non-petitioning spouse is a documented victim of domestic violence by the petitioning spouse, the non-petitioning spouse must consent to the divorce in order for it to occur.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2012-03-02 | Assembly | print number 6992a |
2012-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-04-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04989 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES