NY S04870 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases allowable maximum income of persons occupying rental units otherwise eligible for tax abatement in certain cases under provisions applicable to senior citizens' rent increase exemption (SCRIE).
Title
Increases allowable maximum income of persons occupying rental units otherwise eligible for tax abatement in certain cases under provisions applicable to senior citizens' rent increase exemption (SCRIE).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-12 | PRINT NUMBER 4870A | |
2010-03-12 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO AGING | |
2009-06-01 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A516 (Same As) 2010-04-19 - print number 516a