NY S04845 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 4845A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the exclusion of part-time employees from certain definitions relating to employment and expanding the definition of employer; removes certain exclusions for employer notice requirements for the closing of a facility; removes the discretionary reduction of penalties for employers for certain acts or omissions concerning notice requirements for mass layoffs, relocations or employment loss; removes the maximum time period for determining back pay and other liabilities for certain employees who experience employment loss; allows the attorney general to take certain action to assist certain employees in receiving back pay and other liabilities; requires employers to pay severance to employees when there is a plant closing, relocation, or mass layoff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes the exclusion of part-time employees from certain definitions relating to employment and expanding the definition of employer; removes certain exclusions for employer notice requirements for the closing of a facility; removes the discretionary reduction of penalties for employers for certain acts or omissions concerning notice requirements for mass layoffs, relocations or employment loss; removes the maximum time period for determining back pay and other liabilities for certain employees who experience employment loss; allows the attorney general to take certain action to assist certain employees in receiving back pay and other liabilities; requires employers to pay severance to employees when there is a plant closing, relocation, or mass layoff.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 4845A
2022-01-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2021-02-16SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A07382 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - print number 7382a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback