NY A07382 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - print number 7382a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - print number 7382a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the exclusion of part-time employees from certain definitions relating to employment and expanding the definition of employer; removes certain exclusions for employer notice requirements for the closing of a facility; removes the discretionary reduction of penalties for employers for certain acts or omissions concerning notice requirements for mass layoffs, relocations or employment loss; removes the maximum time period for determining back pay and other liabilities for certain employees who experience employment loss; allows the attorney general to take certain action to assist certain employees in receiving back pay and other liabilities; requires employers to pay severance to employees when there is a plant closing, relocation, or mass layoff.
Title
Removes the exclusion of part-time employees from certain definitions relating to employment and expanding the definition of employer; removes certain exclusions for employer notice requirements for the closing of a facility; removes the discretionary reduction of penalties for employers for certain acts or omissions concerning notice requirements for mass layoffs, relocations or employment loss; removes the maximum time period for determining back pay and other liabilities for certain employees who experience employment loss; allows the attorney general to take certain action to assist certain employees in receiving back pay and other liabilities; requires employers to pay severance to employees when there is a plant closing, relocation, or mass layoff.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | print number 7382a |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04845 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 4845A